Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Newco Capital Group Vi Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Nichols, Adam Richard, O'Brien, Sean Michael, against Alessandro Vasini, Alessandro Vasini, Llc, Alessandro Vasini, Llc-Dba, Dba Alessandro Vasini, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County. This case was filed in Rockland County Superior Courts with Sherri L Eisenpress presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSherri L Eisenpress Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint was filed by NewCo Capital Group VI LLC against Alessandro Vasini, LLC/DBA Alessandro Vasini and Alessandro Vasini. The plaintiff is seeking judgment against the defendants for breach of contract and personal guarantee.
According to ...
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 17, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 17, 2024AFFIRMATION
Date: October 03, 2023CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 17, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: October 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 17, 2024STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: January 17, 2024ANSWER
Date: October 11, 2023NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: October 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A CONTRACT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Exhibit A to Notice to Admit Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 31, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: October 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 17, 2024JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*
Date: October 03, 2023NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: October 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E AFFIRMATION OF NON- MILITARY SERVICE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation Of Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: October 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Signed Settlements Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 12, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2024 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Pleadings |
||
January 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Transaction/Remittance History |
||
January 17, 2024 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 17, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affidavit of Plaintiff |
||
January 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Discovery |
||
January 17, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation of Counsel |
||
January 17, 2024 | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
January 17, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Settlement Agreement |
||
November 16, 2023 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.