Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
At&T Communications Of New York, Inc., At&T Communications Of New York Inc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Hrankiwskyj, Michael, Wassel, Thomas B, against And The Town Of Ramapo, Ramapo Town Of, Ramapo Town Of-Bd Of Assessment, The Assessor Of The Town Of Ramapo, The Board Of Assessment Review Of The Town Of Ramapo, (total of 5) See All represented by Browne, Erika C, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Amy Puerto presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAmy Puerto Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
PETITION
Date: July 22, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 24, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 09, 2023RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: October 24, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 09, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 06, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: August 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 24, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 09, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
November 06, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER Order and Judgment - Tax Cert |
||
October 24, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 24, 2023 |
RJI -RE: OTHER Tax certiorari settlement |
||
October 24, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
August 09, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 24, 2021 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance |
||
August 24, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 09, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Personal Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.