Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, Leiderman, Joel D, against Benot Rousseau, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 22, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 22, 2021AFFIRMATION NON MILTARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 13, 2022SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: June 17, 2022202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: September 14, 2021AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 13, 2022SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: June 17, 2022SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: June 09, 2022AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 13, 2022AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 13, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: January 13, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 08, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on June 17, 2022 | ||
June 17, 2022 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
June 09, 2022 |
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT BY SHERIFF EXECUTION |
||
January 13, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILTARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILTARY Redacted |
||
January 13, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
January 13, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
January 13, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
January 13, 2022 | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on January 13, 2022 | ||
January 13, 2022 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT Redacted per 22 NYCRR JUDGMENT Redacted |
||
September 14, 2021 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.