Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
M&T Bank, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Cody, Erin Lynn, Didone, Kyle C, Lema, Ryan Albert, against Global Sign Cleaning & Maintenance Inc., Shaya Brown, represented by Odierna, Adrienne T, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Margaret Garvey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMargaret Garvey Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2011 |
CategoryCommercial |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions392 days |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Case Cycle Time1008 days |
REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: March 21, 2012NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 23, 2012ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 05, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 05, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: August 21, 2012DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: April 13, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 23, 2012LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 12, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 06, 2015NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER
Date: April 28, 2015MEMORANDUM
Date: May 26, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 15, 2011NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 11, 2014JUDGMENT
Date: January 10, 2013EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 15, 2011EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 23, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 23, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 23, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 08, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - B-1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 23, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: November 08, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: November 08, 2012RJI -RE: OTHER(SPECIFY IN DESCRIPTION AREA)
Date: July 23, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 23, 2012AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 23, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-6 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 23, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 23, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-5 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 23, 2012AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 06, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 23, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 23, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 23, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 23, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 23, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-4 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 23, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 23, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 23, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - B-2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 23, 2012JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: January 10, 2013AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 08, 2012EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 11, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: April 28, 2015AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 28, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 11, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 11, 2014BILL OF COSTS
Date: April 20, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 15, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 11, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 11, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 11, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-3 Â (Motion #001)
Date: July 23, 2012AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: December 11, 2014ANSWER
Date: November 08, 2012AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 08, 2012DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 15, 2012AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 08, 2012Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2015 |
MEMORANDUM MEMO IN CONNECTION WITH DOCUMENTS RETURNED DUE TO ADDRESS PROBLEMS |
||
May 05, 2015 |
ORDER - OTHER ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO PAY ATTORNEYS' FEES |
||
April 28, 2015 | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER | ||
April 28, 2015 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Decision and Order |
||
April 28, 2015 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
April 20, 2015 | Bill of costs | ||
April 13, 2015 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
February 27, 2015 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #002) Margaret Garvey - Motions Judge: Garvey, Hon. Margaret |
|
January 09, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002) Margaret Garvey - Motions Judge: Garvey, Hon. Margaret |
|
January 06, 2015 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #002) Correspondence to Defendant and Chambers |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.