Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Apollo Funding Co, Apollo Funding Co., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Nichols, Adam Richard, O'Brien, Sean Michael, against Kevin D Haynes, K Haynes Trucking, K Haynes Trucking Llc, K Haynes Trucking Llc-Dba, represented by Dale, Dominick R., in the jurisdiction of Rockland County. This case was filed in Rockland County Superior Courts with Hal B Greenwald presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHal B Greenwald Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 21, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint was filed by Apollo Funding Co. against K Haynes Trucking LLC, DBA K Haynes Trucking, and Kevin Damone Haynes. The complaint alleges breach of contract and personal guarantee. According to the complaint, Apollo Funding Co. entered into...
NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: January 08, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001) CONTRACT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 25, 2024INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 08, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 11, 2024CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: November 16, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002) Discovery Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 11, 2024PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: August 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: January 25, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Funding Application Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 08, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 26, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 25, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: January 30, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 25, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002) Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 25, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002) Pleadings Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 11, 2024RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 10, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002) Proof of Funding Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Notice of Default and Sale Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 08, 2024STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: January 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 08, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 08, 2024RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 08, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 05, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 19, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 05, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001) *Corrected*
Date: September 05, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 26, 2023DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: August 26, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 26, 2023ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: August 26, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affirmation Of Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 22, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Contract Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2024 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY | ||
January 25, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Diesel Funding LLC v RCI PLBG Inc |
||
January 25, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
January 25, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Crystal Springs Capital Inc v Big Thicket Coin LLC |
||
January 25, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Capybara Capital LLC v Zilco NW LLC |
||
January 25, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) AJ Equity Group LLC v Urban Bay Housing Fund LLC |
||
January 11, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Affirmation of Counsel |
||
January 11, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Discovery Redacted per 22 NYCRR Discovery Redacted |
||
January 11, 2024 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 11, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #002) Affidavit of Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.