Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na-Tr, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Di Caro, John A, against Ana Duran, Christian Urena, Christopher Urena, Edina Urena Delacruze, Jennifer Urena, (total of 10) See All represented by Lauterbach, Richard S, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Thomas Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 30, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions691 days |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time748 days |
COMPLAINT
Date: July 30, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 16, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2015SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: July 30, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 11, 2015NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: July 30, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 10, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 19, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 20, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 19, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 20, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 25, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 11, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 12, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 11, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 10, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2015CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: February 04, 2016FORECLOSURE -SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INELIGIBLE AFFIRMATION
Date: June 20, 2017RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: March 04, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 04, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2015NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: August 25, 2016AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001) Affidavit of Merit Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 20, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 18, 2015AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 04, 2016ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: March 04, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 16, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 15, 2016CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: June 09, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 09, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 20, 2017FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: January 24, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001) 90 day mailings Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001) Demand Letters Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 20, 2017NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 29, 2017REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: January 24, 2018AFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES
Date: June 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 20, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001) Affidavits of Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 20, 2017CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: July 30, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 04, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 10, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 19, 2015ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 10, 2015REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: November 25, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 24, 2018JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: August 16, 2017MEMORANDUM
Date: January 24, 2018JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: August 16, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 20, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 20, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: December 15, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2018 | Hearing |
Thomas E. Walsh (Trials) STATUS SMF (9:30AM) (Conversion) Judge: Walsh II, Hon. Thomas E. |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Foreclosure Action Surplus Monies Form | |
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
REFEREE REPORT OF SALE Referee's Report of Sale, Statement of Referee, Assignment of Bid, Affidavit of Publication |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization |
|
January 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM Terms of Sale, Memorandum of Sale |
|
August 29, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE entered in the office of the County Clerk on August 16, 2017 | |
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | |
August 04, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #001) Thomas E. Walsh (Motions) Judge: Walsh II, Hon. Thomas E. |
|
July 10, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned Thomas E. Walsh (Trials) CONTROL (Conversion) Judge: Walsh II, Hon. Thomas E. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.