Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
American Friends Of Kollel Oitzer Shas Canada, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Valentine, Paul W., against East Ramapo School District, Ramapo Town Bd Of Assessments, Ramapo Town Of, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Robert M Berliner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M Berliner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2015 |
CategoryTax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
Case Cycle Time349 days |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 30, 2015ANSWER
Date: November 10, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 21, 2016LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 20, 2016PETITION
Date: July 30, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2016 | Hearing |
Settled Robert M. Berliner (Trial) CC (9:15 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Berliner, Hon. Robert M. |
|
May 11, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Margaret Garvey Supreme Initial (first time on), PLC (9:15 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Garvey, Hon. Margaret |
|
April 21, 2016 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Ltr to Adverse Counsel re Court Conference |
||
April 20, 2016 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT LETTER SCHEDULING APPEARANCE IN TAX CERTIORARI MATTER |
||
November 10, 2015 | ANSWER | ||
August 12, 2015 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
||
July 30, 2015 |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION RJI |
||
July 30, 2015 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Town Denial of Grievance |
||
July 30, 2015 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Grievance |
||
July 30, 2015 |
NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #000) Notice of Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.