Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Orange And Rockland Utilities Inc v. Cioffi 1 Inc
On June 04, 2019 a torts - other negligence (construction damage) case was filed by Orange And Rockland Utilities Inc, represented by Golland, Jay R, against Cioffi 1 Inc, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County. Judge Sherri L Eisenpress presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 04, 2019
Last Refreshed
August 01, 2023
Filing Location
Rockland County, NY
Filing Court House
Rockland County Supreme Court
Category
Tort-Other Negligence
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Construction
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Closed
Case Duration
4 months and 6 days
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion 001)
Date: Oct 10, 2019STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: Oct 10, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Aug 15, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Aug 15, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Aug 15, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion 001)
Date: Aug 15, 2019SUMMONS COMPLAINT
Date: Jun 04, 2019Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001) Letter withdrawing motion |
|
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service of Discontinuance |
|
September 06, 2019 | Motion |
Judgment - Default (Motion #001) Decided: 10/10/2019Closed Before Justice: Eisenpress, Hon. Sherri L. Answer demanded: No Judge: Eisenpress, Hon. Sherri L. |
|
September 06, 2019 | hearing |
Fully Submitted - No Opposition (Motion #001) Sherri L. Eisenpress (Motions) Judge: Eisenpress, Hon. Sherri L. |
|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Attorney Affirmation |
|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affidavit of Actual Damages |
|
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) | |
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Affirmation of Mailing | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |