Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Co-Tr, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Golab, Mark, Halkias, William J., Sposato, Melissa A., Wallace, Lisa L, against Alan Messner, Amboy Bank, Benjamin Luria, Capital One N.A., Deutsche Bank National Trust Co-Tr, (total of 15) See All represented by Artale, Louis J, Fleischmann, Jeffrey, Gallo, David A, May, Ted E, Menashe, Yecheskel, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas P Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 06, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions728 days |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time728 days |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: December 06, 2016ORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #001)
Date: December 06, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)
Date: March 02, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: June 24, 2016ANSWER
Date: August 26, 2015ORDER - VACATE (Motion #004)
Date: September 13, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #005)
Date: November 05, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #004)
Date: October 30, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #004)
Date: October 10, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #004)
Date: January 11, 2018ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #005)
Date: October 17, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #004)
Date: September 13, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY (Motion #004)
Date: September 13, 2017ORDER - OTHER (Motion #004)
Date: November 01, 2017JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: July 03, 2017JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: July 03, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY (Motion #005)
Date: October 18, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #005)
Date: October 29, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #005)
Date: October 17, 2019DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: July 03, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #004)
Date: September 26, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #004)
Date: September 13, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP (Motion #005)
Date: October 17, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #005)
Date: October 18, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 05, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 06, 2015STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 19, 2016STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 06, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: June 16, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: May 19, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #001)
Date: June 21, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 17, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 19, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: March 02, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2020 | Hearing |
Held virtual Judge: Zugibe, Hon. Thomas P. |
|
September 08, 2020 | Hearing |
Continued virtual Judge: Zugibe, Hon. Thomas P. |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | |
November 07, 2019 | Hearing |
Stay (Motion #005)
Judge: Dept. (Rockland), Calendar Clerk |
|
November 07, 2019 | Hearing |
Held OTSC(9:30AM) Judge: Dept. (Rockland), Calendar Clerk |
|
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #005) REPLY AFFIRMATION |
|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #005) | |
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #005) 1.11.18 Order NOE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.