Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Adolph Polynice, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Linder, Mark, against Segundo R Fajardo-Quipshi, Steeve Jules, represented by Brill, Alan B, Debellis, Julio, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Thomas Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 29, 2015 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time490 days |
ANSWER
Date: September 01, 2015DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 01, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 31, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 29, 2015ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: September 25, 2015DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 01, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 14, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 29, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 21, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 26, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
September 29, 2016 | Hearing |
Thomas E. Walsh (Trials) SETTLED (Conversion) Judge: Walsh II, Hon. Thomas E. |
|
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
June 02, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Thomas E. Walsh (Trials) Supreme Trial, CC (9:30 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Walsh II, Hon. Thomas E. |
|
November 19, 2015 | Hearing |
Held Thomas E. Walsh (Trials) Supreme Initial (first time on), PLC(9:30AM) (Conversion) Judge: Walsh II, Hon. Thomas E. |
|
October 05, 2015 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
September 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) answer, responses and demands |
|
September 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C photos |
|
September 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B photos |
|
September 25, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A estimates |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.