Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Us Bank Na-Tr, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bebirian, Nicholas John, Briant-Napier, Anita Kay, Conway, Erin Mccall, Katz, Jordan S, against Beryl Braun Aka, Beryl D Braun, Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Richard R Zayas-Referee, Stewart Braun, (total of 5) See All represented by Kolber, Allen A, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County. This case was filed in Rockland County Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Sherri L Eisenpress presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 29, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1144 days |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1144 days |
ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 01, 2017JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: August 16, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: May 31, 2018DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: August 16, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003)
Date: November 27, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003)
Date: November 27, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #002)
Date: May 31, 2018JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: August 16, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: May 31, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 09, 2015ORDER - VACATING JUDGMENT
Date: March 18, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 19, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 09, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2017REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: August 31, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 29, 2015ORDER - VACATING JUDGMENT (Motion #003)
Date: March 18, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: February 16, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)
Date: May 11, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: May 11, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 27, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 30, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2017LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 16, 2016STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: August 05, 2015DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 23, 2015ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 23, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2019 | Hearing |
Sherri L. Eisenpress CONTROL (9:45 A.M.), NO APPS DECISION (Conversion) Judge: Eisenpress, Hon. Sherri L. |
|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - VACATING JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on March 18, 2019 | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - VACATING JUDGMENT (Motion #003) | |
January 11, 2019 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #003) Sherri L. Eisenpress (Motions) Judge: Eisenpress, Hon. Sherri L. |
|
December 07, 2018 | Hearing |
Held Sherri L. Eisenpress Supreme Trial, CONF (9:45 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Eisenpress, Hon. Sherri L. |
|
November 28, 2018 | Motion |
Discontinue (Motion #003) Decided: 03/18/2019Closed Before Justice: Eisenpress, Hon. Sherri L. Answer demanded: No Judge: Eisenpress, Hon. Sherri L. |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #003) | |
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #003) | |
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT (Motion #003) | |
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION (Motion #003) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.