Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Executive Associates North Ii Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Goodfriend, Mark F., against Ramapo Town Of, Ramapo Town Of Bd Of Assessment, represented by Finkelstein, Beth, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County. This case was filed in Rockland County Superior Courts with Robert M Berliner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M Berliner Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedDecember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
PETITION
Date: July 14, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 11, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: February 28, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 10, 2021RJI -RE: NOTE OF ISSUE AND/OR CERTIFICATE OF READINESS
Date: June 29, 2021NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: February 23, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 23, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 certification of income and expense Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 20, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: April 25, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: June 23, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 23, 2021NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 18, 2021NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: February 15, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 28, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: June 29, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 23, 2022STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: July 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 16, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 28, 2022NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: February 09, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 23, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: July 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
July 01, 2022 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | ||
April 25, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
March 30, 2022 | SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED | ||
March 15, 2022 | SUBPOENA ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
February 28, 2022 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) Notice of Appearance |
||
February 28, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
||
February 28, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Notice to Admit |
||
February 23, 2022 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
February 23, 2022 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to Notice to Admit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.