Case Last Refreshed: 2 hours ago
Baruch Aronson, Baruch Aronson In His Capacity As Trustee For The Ester Aronson 2020 Insurance Trust, Baruch Aronson I Tr, Ben Aronson 2020 Insurance Trust, Ester Aronson, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Fleming, Daniel James, Siegel, Jared Solomon, against Brave Strategies Llc, Brave Strategies, Llc, Massmutual Life Insurance Co, New York Life Insurance Co, Penn Mutual Life Insurance Co, (total of 5) See All represented by Burr, Kendall Johan, Knepper, Randi Faith, Lopez, Stephanie, Roseman, Daniel Harris, Silverman, Zachary Winthrop, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Rockland County. This case was filed in Rockland County Superior Courts Supreme with Christie D'Alessio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 06, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedMay 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 14, 2024STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: March 22, 2024ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: April 03, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: March 14, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: March 14, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 14, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: March 14, 2024ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #004)
Date: March 12, 2024COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Second Amended Complaint
Date: March 14, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 13, 2024LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: March 12, 2024ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 12, 2024ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #005)
Date: March 12, 2024ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 12, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 06, 2024ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: March 04, 2024ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 26, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 26, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 26, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #005)
Date: February 26, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 26, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 26, 2024ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 26, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #004)
Date: February 26, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 23, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 23, 2024AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 23, 2024ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: February 23, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 23, 2024ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 20, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 20, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: February 23, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 20, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 20, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 20, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 20, 2024ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 20, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 20, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: February 05, 2024STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: January 31, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 06, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 31, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: February 01, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 12, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 12, 2024STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: January 31, 2024COMPLAINT (AMENDED) Amended Complaint and Summonses
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Amended Complaint
Date: January 05, 2024LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 18, 2023STIPULATION - AMENDING PLEADING(S)
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: December 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 15, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 15, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 29, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 25, 2023STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: October 19, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: August 28, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 01, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: June 06, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: June 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 06, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 31, 2023STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: June 14, 2023ANSWER
Date: July 28, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint
Date: June 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: June 06, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: June 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #006) Plaintiffs' Redacted SAC
Date: April 15, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 15, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 15, 2024STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: April 10, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #006)
Date: April 15, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: April 08, 2024STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 11, 2024LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: April 08, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2024 | AFFIRMATION (Motion #006) | ||
April 15, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #006) Plaintiffs' Redacted SAC Plaintiffs' Redacted SAC Redacted |
||
April 15, 2024 | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #006) | ||
April 15, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #006) Certified Regulatory Record of Reg 187 |
||
April 15, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #006) Indep. Ins. Agents & Brokers of N.Y., Inc. v. N.Y. State Dept of Fin. Servs. |
||
April 15, 2024 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #006) | ||
April 11, 2024 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
April 10, 2024 |
STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Stipulation and Proposed Order regarding Case Deadlines |
||
April 08, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
April 08, 2024 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.