Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Metropolitan Property & Casualty Insurance Co, filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Ruhl, Charles Thomas, against Annette M Loconti, represented by Fellows, Robert L, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County. This case was filed in Rockland County Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Victor J Alfieri presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 06, 2016 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
|
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time30 days |
PETITION
Date: July 06, 2016STIPULATION - OTHER (Motion #001)
Date: August 04, 2016RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 06, 2016NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #001)
Date: July 06, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2016 | Motion |
(Motion #001) Decided: 08/05/2016Withdrawn Before Justice: Alfieri Jr, Hon. Victor J. Answer demanded: No Judge: Alfieri Jr, Hon. Victor J. |
|
August 05, 2016 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Victor J. Alfieri (Motions) Judge: Alfieri Jr, Hon. Victor J. |
|
August 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER (Motion #001) Stipulation withdrawing Petition |
|
July 22, 2016 | Hearing |
Victor J. Alfieri (Trials) STIP REC D (Conversion) Judge: Alfieri Jr, Hon. Victor J. |
|
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavits of Service |
|
July 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavit of Personal Service |
|
July 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affidavits of Service via first class mail |
|
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Petition to Stay Arbitration | |
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION RJI/Notice of Petition |
|
July 06, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #001) Notice of Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.