Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Patrick R. Adelson, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Pollack, Martin H, against Celia A. Mitchell, Leonard E. Mitchell, represented by Debellis, Julio, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County. This case was filed in Rockland County Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Alfred Weiner presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlfred Weiner Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2011 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time110 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 16, 2011SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 01, 2011STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE
Date: December 20, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE Stipulation |
|
November 16, 2011 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
November 10, 2011 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
September 22, 2011 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
September 01, 2011 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.