Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Iris Cohen Exx, Sid Cohen Est Of, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Adams, Jeffrey M, Daiter, Ian Craig, against Abna I Realty Llc, Jaca Entertainment Corp, represented by Naparty, Matthew W., Stiefeld, Marc E, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County, NY, . Rockland County, NY Superior Courts with Rolf Thorsen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Trip And Fall) |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
ANSWER
Date: July 23, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 02, 2020STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 19, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: August 10, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 12, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: August 10, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 12, 2021COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: April 13, 2021SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: April 13, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: June 17, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: June 23, 2021ANSWER
Date: July 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 12, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 12, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: July 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 12, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 12, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: April 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 29, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 09, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: November 29, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 08, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: June 21, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 21, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 12, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003) Plaintiff's Bill of Particulars
Date: November 29, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: November 03, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: August 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 29, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: April 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 29, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: March 10, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 04, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: February 06, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 23, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 04, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Order with Notice of Entry of Appeal Decision |
||
July 21, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
April 01, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
March 10, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
March 08, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
March 08, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Decision & Order |
||
December 09, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003) Reply Affirmation |
||
December 08, 2021 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND 3101(d) Alexander Mercer, MD |
||
November 29, 2021 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Amended Expert Witness Disclosure - Dagenhsein |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.