Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Iris Cohen Exx, Sid Cohen Est Of, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Adams, Jeffrey M, Daiter, Ian Craig, against Abna I Realty Llc, Jaca Entertainment Corp, represented by Naparty, Matthew W., Stiefeld, Marc E, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County. This case was filed in Rockland County Superior Courts with Rolf Thorsen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Trip And Fall) |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
ANSWER
Date: July 23, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 02, 2020STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 19, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: August 10, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 12, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: August 10, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 12, 2021COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: April 13, 2021SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: April 13, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: June 17, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: June 23, 2021ANSWER
Date: July 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 12, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: November 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 12, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: July 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 12, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 12, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: April 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 29, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #003)
Date: December 09, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: November 29, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 08, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: June 21, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 21, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 12, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: October 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003) Plaintiff's Bill of Particulars
Date: November 29, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: November 03, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: August 24, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: October 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 29, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: April 12, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 29, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: March 10, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 04, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: February 06, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 23, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
January 04, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Order with Notice of Entry of Appeal Decision |
||
July 21, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
April 01, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
March 10, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
March 08, 2022 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
March 08, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Decision & Order |
||
December 09, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #003) Reply Affirmation |
||
December 08, 2021 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND 3101(d) Alexander Mercer, MD |
||
November 29, 2021 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Amended Expert Witness Disclosure - Dagenhsein |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.