Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Dina Wolleben, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Tramaglini, Christopher S, against Harvest Bistro Of Piermont Llc-Dba, Mark Pavlicek, Pier 701, represented by Condon, Brian K, Dudley, Mathew Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County. This case was filed in Rockland County Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Victor J Alfieri presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 03, 2016 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time119 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 03, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 26, 2016REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: August 16, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 26, 2016ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 29, 2016STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: June 24, 2016ANSWER
Date: July 18, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2016 | Hearing |
Victor J. Alfieri (Trials) PLC (2:00 P.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Alfieri Jr, Hon. Victor J. |
|
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stip of Discon as to Defendant Pavlicek |
|
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stip of Discon as to Defendant Harvest |
|
August 16, 2016 | Docket Event | REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) | |
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference |
|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A- Agreement |
|
July 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) Verified Answer and Counterclaims |
|
July 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Attorney's Affirmation of Service Upon Plaintiff |
|
July 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Attorney's Affirmation of Service Upon Defendant Pavlicek |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.