Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Joseph Schwartz, National General Insurance Co-Aso, National General Insurance Co. A S O Joseph Schwartz, filed a(n) Subrogation - Insurance case represented by Monaco, Russell G, against Abraham S Farkas, Aron Fischman, Energy Creators Llc, Midpost Cleaning Inc, Midpost Cleaning Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Bynum, Nicole Monica, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County. This case was filed in Rockland County Superior Courts with Sherri L Eisenpress presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Property Subrogation) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeSubrogation |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 09, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 31, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: August 31, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 29, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: July 01, 2021NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: August 31, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 29, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 31, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 04, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: February 16, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: April 14, 2022STIPULATION - AMENDING PLEADING(S)
Date: April 14, 2022ANSWER
Date: May 02, 2022SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)
Date: April 14, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 01, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 26, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 23, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: September 16, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: September 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 23, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 03, 2022ANSWER
Date: July 09, 2021CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: July 09, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: September 09, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 03, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 03, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 14, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: August 31, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 01, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: September 16, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: September 16, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: August 17, 2022NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: November 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 03, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 03, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
November 30, 2022 |
NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION Plaintiff's Post Depo Demands |
||
October 03, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Default Motion |
||
October 03, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #001) SCRA Aron Fischman |
||
October 03, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Supplemental Summons and Amended Verified Complaint |
||
October 03, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Deposition of James Gesauldo |
||
October 03, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Deposition of Abraham Farkas |
||
October 03, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service Aron Fischman |
||
October 03, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint |
||
October 03, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Attorney Affirmation in Support |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.