Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Dadin Torres, Fernando Torres, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Joyce, Dwight D, against Mavis Discount Tire, Inc, represented by Bentzen, Richard D, Dolan, Adam Richard, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County. This case was filed in Rockland County Superior Courts with Rolf Thorsen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 06, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: June 04, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: October 13, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: September 03, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 03, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 17, 2021SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: April 06, 2021COMPLAINT
Date: April 22, 2021ANSWER
Date: May 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 04, 2021NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION
Date: May 26, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: July 07, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 18, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: January 11, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -OPPOSITION TO REQUEST
Date: December 01, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: December 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2022 | ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE -OPPOSITION TO REQUEST | ||
December 01, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 09, 2022 |
ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Defendant Mavis Discount Tire, Inc.'s Answer to Third Party Plaintiff Travelers Personal Insurance C Defendant Mavis Discount Tire, Inc.'s Answer to Third Party Plaintiff Travelers Personal Insurance C ... show more |
||
January 18, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
January 11, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 13, 2021 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
September 03, 2021 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
September 03, 2021 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
July 07, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
June 17, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.