Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Maureen Squillini, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ruyack, Joseph E, against Limary Rodriguez, represented by Rogers, James A, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County. This case was filed in Rockland County Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court with Rolf Thorsen presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2019 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time496 days |
ANSWER
Date: February 14, 2019STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 10, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 18, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 24, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 14, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 24, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2020 | Hearing |
Discontinued STIP OF DISC REC'D Judge: Thorsen, Hon. Rolf M. |
|
March 25, 2020 | Hearing |
Adjourned
Judge: Thorsen, Hon. Rolf M. |
|
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | |
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
|
October 30, 2019 | Hearing |
Held CC (9:30 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Thorsen, Hon. Rolf M. |
|
June 06, 2019 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Rolf M. Thorsen - Motions Judge: Thorsen, Hon. Rolf M. |
|
June 06, 2019 | Hearing |
Held Rolf M. Thorsen Supreme Initial (first time on), PLC (9:30 A.M.) (Conversion) Judge: Thorsen, Hon. Rolf M. |
|
May 30, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT NOTICE | |
May 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) affidavit of service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.