Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bank Of America Na, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Rothman, Keith H, against Shraga Goldhirsch, in the jurisdiction of Rockland County. This case was filed in Rockland County Superior Courts Rockland County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions76 days |
Filing LocationRockland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseRockland County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time77 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 01, 2019SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: December 04, 2020SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: December 04, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 01, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR
Date: April 10, 2019JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: April 10, 2019202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: February 15, 2019AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS
Date: April 10, 2019AFFIRMATION
Date: April 10, 2019JUDGMENT
Date: April 10, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 24, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2020 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT R&R FILE# 1269723 | ||
December 04, 2020 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on December 04, 2020 | ||
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT OF MERIT R&R FILE # 1269723 |
|
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) JUDGMENT R&R FILE # 1269723 |
|
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS SOL AFFIRMATION R&R FILE # 1269723 |
|
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION NON-MIL R&R FILE # 1269723 |
|
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on April 10, 2019 | |
February 15, 2019 | Docket Event | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.