Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Atlantic Medical & Diagnostic, P.C A A O Malcolm Parker, filed a(n) No Fault case represented by Rizzo, Angelo Francesco, against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, represented by Mcerlean, Nicole Rose, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. This case was filed in Richmond County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 01, 2022 |
CategoryNo Fault |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
|
TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: July 24, 2023NOTICE OF TRIAL
Date: January 19, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 28, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 01, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2023 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Expert Witness Disclosure |
||
July 24, 2023 |
TRIAL DOCUMENTS Trial Packet Possible SSN Administratively Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR Trial Packet Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
January 19, 2023 | NOTICE OF TRIAL | ||
December 07, 2022 | Answers | ||
November 28, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
November 01, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 01, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.