Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Joseph A. Morrone Jr., Phyllis Morrone, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Gonzalez, Francisco, Marangos, John Zachary, against Nancy Cucuzza, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. This case was filed in Richmond County Superior Courts Richmond County Supreme Court with Philip G Minardo presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 02, 2016 |
CategoryCommercial - Ucc |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseRichmond County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time17 days |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 26, 2017PETITION
Date: December 02, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #001)
Date: December 05, 2016RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 02, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 02, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: December 02, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: December 02, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #002)
Date: January 30, 2017ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) (Motion #01)
Date: December 02, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 16, 2017 | Motion |
CONSOLIDATE (Motion #002) Decided: 02/16/2017MOTION WITHDRAWN Before Justice: PHILIP G MINARDO Answer demanded: No Judge: PHILIP G MINARDO |
|
February 16, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION WITHDRAWN (Motion #002) DCM PART 6M Judge: PHILIP G MINARDO |
|
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #002) | |
January 26, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) | |
December 19, 2016 | Hearing |
PRENOTE DISPOSITION BY MOTION DCM PART 6 Judge: PHILIP G MINARDO |
|
December 15, 2016 | Motion |
MISCELLANEOUS (Motion #001) Decided: 12/15/2016MOTION DENIED Before Justice: PHILIP G MINARDO Answer demanded: No Judge: PHILIP G MINARDO |
|
December 15, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DENIED (Motion #001) DCM PART 6M DSCH LIEN Judge: PHILIP G MINARDO |
|
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #001) | |
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event | PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.