Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
The Office Of The Richmond County District Attorney, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case represented by Adames, George Daniel, against Andrey Titov, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. This case was filed in Richmond County Superior Courts with Marina Mundy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 19, 2023 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Extreme Risk Protection Order |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Sealed
Date: April 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2023 |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) Sealed |
||
April 28, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Sealed |
||
April 24, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Sealed |
||
April 21, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Sealed |
||
April 20, 2023 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT Sealed |
||
April 20, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER Sealed |
||
April 20, 2023 |
ORDER - EXTREME RISK PROTECTION ORDER (TEMPORARY-GRANTED) Sealed |
||
April 19, 2023 |
SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION Sealed Sealed Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
April 19, 2023 |
APPLICATION - EXTREME RISK PROTECTION ORDER (AMENDED) Sealed |
||
April 19, 2023 |
RJI -RE: EXTREME RISK PROTECTION ORDER APPLICATION Sealed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.