Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Campbell, Dana L filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Tamara L. Mosbarger presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2002 |
CategoryConservatorship Of Person & Estate |
Last RefreshedJanuary 05, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review of Person Only
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing Regarding Cost Assessment PR 1851.5
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
January 04, 2022 | Tentative Ruling |
Based upon the Court Investigator's report dated December 20, 2021 the conservatorship remains necessary and appropriate and shall continue. Fees are deferred. The court investigator's information she...
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Declaration and Order re Conservatorship Investigation | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Continuing Conservatorship
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Tentative Ruling - Probate Based upon the Court Investigator's report dated December 20, 2021 the conservatorship remains necessary and appropriate and shall continue. Fees are deferred. The court investigator's information sheet is due by November 21, 2023 with a review hearing on January 2, 2024 at 10:15 a.m. The Court will sign the form of order submitted by counsel. |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing Regarding Cost Assessment PR 1851.5
Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Conservatorship Review of Person Only -Biennial Review Judge: Mosbarger, Tamara L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.