Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Mark Bershad, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Maltese, Carl Alessandro, against Allan Rohrlich, Ean Holdings, Llc, represented by Barrett, Paul Andrew, Burkart, Michael Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. This case was filed in Richmond County Superior Courts with Kim Dollard presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management281 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time592 days |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 11, 2019STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 20, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 13, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 06, 2018ANSWER
Date: January 02, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2020 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
January 14, 2020 | Hearing |
Settled IAS Part 11 COMPLIA, AM CALL (Conversion) Judge: DiDomenico, Hon. Catherine M. |
|
January 14, 2020 | Hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT PRE-NOTE IAS PART 11 COMPLIA AM CALL Judge: HON. CATHERINE M DIDOMENICO |
|
January 13, 2020 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to the Court - Case submitted to Arbitration |
||
December 11, 2019 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
November 29, 2019 | COURT NOTICE | ||
September 13, 2019 | Hearing |
Held IAS Part 11 PRELIMINARY CONF, AM CALL (Conversion) Judge: DiDomenico, Hon. Catherine M. |
|
September 13, 2019 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
September 13, 2019 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE HELD IAS PART 11 PRELIMINARY CONF AM CALL Judge: HON. CATHERINE M DIDOMENICO |
|
August 14, 2019 | COURT NOTICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.