Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Taniqua Goode, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Frekhtman, Arkady, against Sheyla Hunt, represented by Brown, David Alexander, Keely, Harry Abbott, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. This case was filed in Richmond County Superior Courts Richmond County Supreme Court with Ralph Porzio presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2018 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseRichmond County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time209 days |
ANSWER
Date: July 03, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 15, 2019RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 04, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: February 11, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 17, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 06, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 10, 2021ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: February 11, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 15, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2021 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Court regarding scheduled deposition |
||
May 10, 2021 | BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
April 06, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
February 11, 2021 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 11, 2021 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
January 04, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Answer | |
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons & Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.