Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Brian Peters, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Herbert, Jason Todd, Krentsel, Steven, against Department Of Sanitation, The City Of New York, represented by Counsel, Corporation, Famulari, Gianna M., in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. This case was filed in Richmond County Superior Courts with Thomas P Aliotta presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 10, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Premise) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
ANSWER
Date: December 24, 2020ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: February 09, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 01, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 18, 2020SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 10, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2021 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
February 22, 2021 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
February 09, 2021 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
December 24, 2020 | ANSWER | ||
December 01, 2020 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 01, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
December 01, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 01, 2020 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
November 18, 2020 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 18, 2020 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.