Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Vsp Industries, Inc., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Meehan, Amanda Anne, Slama, Mark A, against Abc Llc 1-10, John And Jane Does 1-10, Northfield Bank, Pls Check Cashers Of New York, Inc., Xyz Corp. 1-10, (total of 5) See All represented by Levy, Ian N, Valenziano, Anthony Carmine, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. This case was filed in Richmond County Superior Courts with Catherine M Didomenico presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCatherine M Didomenico Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 12, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Ucc |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
This complaint alleges that VSP Industries, Inc. ("Plaintiff" or "VSP") is the victim of a fraudulent check-cashing scheme. Multiple parties cashed over $100,000 in forged checks at several PLS locations in and around Staten Island, New York. Northfi...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 10, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: January 10, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: November 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #002)
Date: January 10, 2024ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST
Date: January 03, 2024STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: December 15, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 10, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 15, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: January 02, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Fraudulent Checks (redacted) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 12, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: October 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #002) Summons and Complaint and Exhibit |
||
January 10, 2024 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | ||
January 10, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #002) AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT |
||
January 10, 2024 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 03, 2024 | ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST | ||
January 02, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
December 15, 2023 | STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER | ||
November 15, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | ||
November 15, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
November 15, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.