Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Sholom B. Ginsberg, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Campisi, Joseph, against Carlos Matias-Matos, represented by Mumford, Roger E., in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. This case was filed in Richmond County Superior Courts Richmond County Supreme Court with Orlando Marrazzo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseRichmond County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 04, 2018ORDER - CERTIFICATION
Date: September 11, 2018ORDER - CERTIFICATION
Date: October 05, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 09, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 13, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 14, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 15, 2020ORDER - OTHER (Motion #001)
Date: January 15, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001)
Date: November 08, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: November 08, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: November 08, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 25, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: June 06, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: March 30, 2018ANSWER
Date: February 13, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
August 12, 2019 | Hearing |
OTHER FINAL DISP. POST-NOTE SETTLEMENT CONF/MEDIATION PART ARB 18 RICHMOND TERRACE Judge: REFEREE ROBERT W SOOS |
|
August 08, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED SETTLEMENT CONF/MEDIATION PART 9:30 AM Judge: REFEREE ROBERT W SOOS |
|
July 01, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED SETTLEMENT CONF/MEDIATION PART 9:30 AM ROOM 114 18 RICHMOND TERRACE Judge: REFEREE ROBERT W SOOS |
|
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE | |
April 24, 2019 | Hearing |
CONFERENCE HELD IAS PART 21 CC Judge: ORLANDO MARRAZZO, JR |
|
March 12, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED IAS PART 21 CC Judge: ORLANDO MARRAZZO, JR |
|
February 13, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED IAS PART 21 CC Judge: ORLANDO MARRAZZO, JR |
|
February 06, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED DCM PART 21 CC Judge: ORLANDO MARRAZZO, JR |
|
January 15, 2019 | Hearing |
ORDER SIGNED (Motion #001) DCM PART 21M DENIED Judge: ORLANDO MARRAZZO, JR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.