Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Admir Paljevic, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bush, Michael H., against Metropolitan Transportation Authority, New York City Transit Authority, Yanmou Li, represented by Correa, Haydee, Sciretta, Antonia M., in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts with Orlando Marrazzo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOrlando Marrazzo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 07, 2021ANSWER
Date: October 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 20, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 03, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: March 28, 2023BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: April 04, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 03, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: April 04, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: April 27, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 04, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: April 04, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: April 28, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Signed Transcript |
||
April 27, 2023 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
April 04, 2023 | Affidavit of Service | ||
April 04, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION Plaintiff's Affirmation of Good Faith PC |
||
April 04, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
April 04, 2023 |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Plaintiff's Request for PC |
||
April 03, 2023 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Verified Bill of Particulars |
||
April 03, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 28, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS NYCTA Demand for Bill of Particulars |
||
December 03, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of service for Yanmou Li |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.