Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Silas Ajawuihe, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Coleman, Parice M., Duke, Nicole Evelyn, against Carmen Mathe, Jane Mathe The First Name Being Fictitious, Lawrence Mathe, represented by Borrell, Jeffrey Francis Peter, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts with Ralph Porzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph Porzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Dog Attack) |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 26, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: April 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 06, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 06, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 05, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - CONFORMED COPY
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 06, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 05, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003)
Date: April 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 09, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 08, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 03, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: December 20, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: October 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 23, 2021BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: November 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 23, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: November 23, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: December 28, 2021ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION
Date: December 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 08, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 06, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 08, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 07, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 07, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 08, 2021ANSWER
Date: September 13, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 08, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 18, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 07, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: September 28, 2022ORDER - CERTIFICATION
Date: September 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A. Â (Motion #001)
Date: October 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 03, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: February 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 07, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 07, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: July 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: July 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 20, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: August 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 20, 2022NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER
Date: July 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 29, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 30, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 08, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #002)
Date: July 20, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: January 18, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: January 24, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: January 24, 2023TRIAL DOCUMENTS
Date: January 23, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S)
Date: January 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S)
Date: January 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S)
Date: January 25, 2023ORDER - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: January 24, 2023ORDER - AMENDING CAPTION
Date: January 25, 2023EXTRACT
Date: January 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
April 20, 2023 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Stipulation of Settlement |
||
April 13, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #003) Affirmation in Opposition to Defendant's Order to Show Cause |
||
April 06, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
April 06, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
April 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M (Motion #003) CROSS-PLAINTIFF LAWRENCE MATHE |
||
April 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - T (Motion #003) BLANC C-3 FORM |
||
April 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #003) DIRECT-DEFENSE AIDBE CASTHELIOLA |
||
April 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #003) DIRECT-DEFENSE ANNA WILLIAMS |
||
April 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #003) JURY CHARGES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.