Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Janine R. Pitta-Horowitz, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Petersson, Everett John, against Liberty Mutual Insurance, represented by Mastoros, James, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. This case was filed in Richmond County Superior Courts with Ronald Castorina presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Contracts) |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 25, 2021MEMORANDUM
Date: May 16, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 11, 2023NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: June 13, 2023ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING
Date: August 02, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 30, 2023ORDER - CERTIFICATION
Date: June 13, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: September 20, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: May 10, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 15, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 16, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 03, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: July 08, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 09, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 04, 2022ANSWER
Date: October 09, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 13, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 13, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 16, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: October 09, 2021BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: May 16, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 17, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2023 |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance |
||
September 20, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 02, 2023 |
ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING Short form order |
||
June 13, 2023 |
NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Note of Issue |
||
June 13, 2023 | ORDER - CERTIFICATION | ||
May 16, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM Good faith letter for discovery |
||
May 10, 2023 | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | ||
March 30, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER Short form order |
||
February 15, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER Short form order |
||
January 31, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Post EBT Demands for Discovery and Inspection |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.