Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Nathaniel Wyatte, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lucarelli, Thomas Angelo, against Isabella Peduto, Pamela Peduto, represented by Lesperance, Nicole Emley, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts with Ralph Porzio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRalph Porzio Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 25, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 24, 2021ANSWER
Date: September 24, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 15, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 14, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 07, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: November 30, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: December 01, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 14, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 07, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 10, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: November 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 10, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
September 14, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
March 15, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Discovery |
||
December 07, 2021 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
December 07, 2021 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Discovery |
||
December 01, 2021 | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | ||
December 01, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 30, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
November 05, 2021 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 05, 2021 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.