Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Alexandra Spangler, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Lucarelli, Thomas Angelo, against Carl Cruz-Holden, Daniel Holden, Peter Chiaracane, Ralph Peter Chiaracane Jr., represented by Bartling, Dennis Christopher, Mastoros, James, Panek, Leigh Ann, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. This case was filed in Richmond County Superior Courts Richmond County Supreme Court with Orlando Marrazzo presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management89 days |
|
Filing DateJune 22, 2017 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseRichmond County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time278 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 05, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 16, 2017STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: March 05, 2018ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: August 16, 2017ANSWER
Date: July 20, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 22, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2018 | Hearing |
Settled DCM Part 21 Judge: Marrazzo Jr., Hon. Orlando |
|
March 27, 2018 | Hearing |
OTHER SETTLEMENT PRE-NOTE DCM PART 21 Judge: ORLANDO MARRAZZO, JR |
|
March 06, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned DCM Part 21 CC (Conversion) Judge: Marrazzo Jr., Hon. Orlando |
|
March 06, 2018 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED DCM PART 21 CC Judge: ORLANDO MARRAZZO, JR |
|
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE | |
January 30, 2018 | Hearing |
Adjourned DCM Part 21 CC (Conversion) Judge: Marrazzo Jr., Hon. Orlando |
|
January 30, 2018 | Hearing |
COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE ADJOURND DCM PART 21 CC Judge: ORLANDO MARRAZZO, JR |
|
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.