Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bajram Dombalic, Samuel Garcia, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Diprisco, Dominic, against James Cornelius, Yevgeni Kaniayev, represented by Zachary, Deborah Christina, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts with Ronald Castorina presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald Castorina Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 15, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (205-E) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 15, 2021ANSWER
Date: September 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 20, 2021CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: November 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 14, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 14, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 14, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 31, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: November 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 14, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 14, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: October 31, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: October 31, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 14, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 02, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2023SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION
Date: January 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2023STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: January 27, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 13, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: February 03, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 13, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #002)
Date: February 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: March 14, 2023ORDER - OTHER *Corrected*
Date: March 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: March 09, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #002)
Date: March 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
March 09, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
March 09, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #002) word count certification |
||
March 08, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER *Corrected* Short form order |
||
February 13, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
February 13, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
February 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Original motion |
||
February 13, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) | ||
February 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Order |
||
February 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Affirmation in Opposition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.