Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Thi Truong, Loan My, Truong, Son Long, Nguyen, Gai, Truong, Kevin, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Philip A. Champlin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2006 |
CategoryChange Of Name/Gender |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Case Cycle Time55 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order 214210-Order Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per ORDER [214210] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
February 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
February 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Feb 15 2007 Type: 244710 - Judgment: Court Finding Manner : 241210 - Before Trial: No Sttlmnt Cnf/ADR |
|
February 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 231210-OSC Hearing; In The Matter of Truong, Kevin et al Motion OSC Details: 221160 - Name Change ; Judge: J21120 Champlin Philip A. Judge: Champlin, Philip A. |
|
January 24, 2007 | Docket Event |
Affidavit: Proof of Publication 233120-Affidavit of Publication Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION [233120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Certification 233320-Certification Filed/Issued By: 241110 - Agency CERTIFICATION [233320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By AGENCY [241110] |
|
December 28, 2006 | Docket Event |
Order: Show Cause 214220-Order: Show Cause Motion/OSC Detail: 221160 - Name Change Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per ORDER: SHOW CAUSE [214220] Motion: NAME CHANGE [221160] Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
December 22, 2006 | Docket Event | Cause Of Action | |
December 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Fee Waiver Order-Grant 211140-Fee Waiver Order-Grant Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per FEE WAIVER ORDER-GRANT [211140] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
|
December 22, 2006 | Docket Event |
Petition Filed 212110-Petition Filed/Issued By: 912320 - Petitioner Pro Per PETITION [212110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By PETITIONER PRO PER [912320] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.