Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Donna Fortune, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Beldock, Steven H., Ellman, Michael P., Isaac, Brian J., against Jane Doe Employee At Mcdonald'S Drive Thru Window, Jane Doe Employee At Mcdonald'S Drive Thru Window, Jane Doe Oluwbusola, Mcdonald'S Corporation, Olubwusola Atanda, (total of 7) See All represented by Albert, Alan Kenneth, Boyd, Kristyn Marie, Moran, Thomas John, Stonberg, Michael L, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts with Lizette Colon presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLizette Colon Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 25, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Burn) |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 25, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 06, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 14, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 14, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 14, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 23, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 14, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: November 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 14, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: October 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 14, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: October 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #001)
Date: September 14, 2021COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: June 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #002)
Date: October 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: November 01, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: November 01, 2021COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: June 07, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 08, 2022NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: December 02, 2021SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: December 03, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 02, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 01, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: December 16, 2021ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: December 30, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 07, 2022SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: February 28, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: February 28, 2022ANSWER
Date: March 30, 2022NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: May 26, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 28, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 24, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: September 20, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 10, 2021MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: November 01, 2021NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: October 27, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 23, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 02, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 01, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: December 22, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #002)
Date: December 01, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: October 26, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: November 10, 2021ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: December 30, 2021NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: June 06, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 08, 2022ANSWER
Date: April 04, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 09, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: June 08, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 10, 2022REQUEST FOR PRE-MOTION CONFERENCE (COMPLIANCE PART)
Date: September 15, 2022COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: September 20, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: October 25, 2022COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: December 03, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 08, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #003) Plaintiff's Bill of Particulars Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: November 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 08, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 08, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: November 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 08, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 17, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 21, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #003)
Date: November 21, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: November 21, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 30, 2022ORDER - AMENDED
Date: November 29, 2022ORDER - MEDIATION
Date: January 09, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: January 30, 2023NOTICE
Date: January 30, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 25, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 25, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 03, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: February 17, 2023NOTE OF ISSUE (JURY DEMAND PREV PAID)
Date: February 07, 2023ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: February 06, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY *Corrected*
Date: February 07, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 06, 2023NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: February 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to the Judge |
||
February 27, 2023 | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) | ||
February 17, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND 3101(D) Expert Disclosure |
||
February 07, 2023 |
NOTE OF ISSUE (JURY DEMAND PREV PAID) Note of Issue and Affirmation of Compliance |
||
February 07, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY *Corrected* Order with Notice of Entry & proof of service |
||
February 06, 2023 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE Dated 2-6-23 |
||
February 03, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) 2nd Amended Compliance Conf. Order - Proposed |
||
January 30, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS Notarized Affidavit of No Additional Documents Video as per Court Order |
||
January 30, 2023 | NOTICE | ||
January 25, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.