Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Frank D'Adamo, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Renna, Robert J, Renna, Robert J., against John Doe, Robert Degen, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. This case was filed in Richmond County Superior Courts Richmond County Supreme Court with Judith N. Mcmahon presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 30, 2012 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseRichmond County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time844 days |
ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 02, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: March 11, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: December 05, 2013ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 03, 2013ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 17, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 30, 2012STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 24, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
March 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Michael Degan |
|
March 02, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
March 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - OTHER STIPULATION ADJOURNING PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE (FAXED) |
|
February 06, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
January 17, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | |
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
October 03, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
July 01, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.