Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mee Suk Kim, Peter Jung Hwan Kim, filed a(n) Tort case represented by Park, Inho A., against Raymond Joseph Sullivan, represented by Goodovitch, Paul Ian, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. This case was filed in Richmond County Superior Courts Richmond County Supreme Court with Judith N. Mcmahon presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 30, 2012 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
||
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
||
Filing Court HouseRichmond County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time656 days |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 16, 2014STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: January 03, 2014ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 06, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 30, 2012ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 02, 2014STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 17, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
July 02, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
June 06, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER - OTHER | |
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY | |
April 16, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | |
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - OTHER | |
August 14, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
July 03, 2013 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
December 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service | |
November 30, 2012 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Complaints |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.