Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
The City Of New York, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Quhshi, Mohamed D., against Jane Doe, John Doe, P & I Realty, Inc., The Land And Building Known As 3785 Victory Boulevard, Tax Block #2786, Tax Lot #29, County Of Richmond, City And State Of New York, represented by Volshteyn, Goara Gabriella, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. This case was filed in Richmond County Superior Courts with Lisa Grey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Nuisance Abatement) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: February 17, 2023STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: February 17, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: February 17, 2023NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: January 09, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 09, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 13, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 13, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 13, 2023ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: January 13, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: January 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 23, 2023ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION Â (Motion #001)
Date: January 26, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2023 |
NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) No Fee Authorization (Stipulation of Settlement) |
||
February 17, 2023 |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Stipulation of Settlement |
||
February 17, 2023 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Settlement |
||
January 27, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
January 26, 2023 |
ORDER - (PROPOSED) "SUBMIT ORDER" PER JUDGES DECISION (Motion #001) Order (proposed) |
||
January 23, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
January 23, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
January 13, 2023 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
January 13, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Attorney Affirmation |
||
January 13, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #001) Affidavit of Undercover Officer #C163 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.