Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Baisley, Zack Everett, Medina, Christopher E., against Maria Miller, Michael Miller, Michele Iesu, New York City Environmental Control Board, New York City Parking Violations Bureau, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts Richmond County Supreme Court with Residential Foreclosure Part presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 27, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseRichmond County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time802 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002)
Date: September 12, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002)
Date: September 12, 2017LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 05, 2015ORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #001)
Date: June 08, 2017ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #002)
Date: November 06, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: July 25, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 27, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 22, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 27, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 15, 2015ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: July 25, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 10, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 23, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #001)
Date: July 25, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #002)
Date: September 12, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #002) | |
October 06, 2017 | Motion |
DISCONTINUE ACTION (Motion #002) Decided: 10/06/2017ORDER ATTACHED Before Justice: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT Answer demanded: No Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
|
October 06, 2017 | Hearing |
ORDER ATTACHED (Motion #002) RES FORECLOSURE PART MOTIONS Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
|
September 12, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #002) | |
September 12, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #002) | |
September 12, 2017 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #002) | |
September 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #002) ATTORNEY AFFIRMATION |
|
September 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) AFFIDAVIT OF MAILING |
|
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #001) | |
April 13, 2017 | Hearing |
ORDER ATTACHED (Motion #001) RES FORECLOSURE PART MOTIONS Judge: RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE PT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.