Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The Bank Of New York Mellon Fka The Bank Of New York, As Trustee For The Certificateholders Of The Cwabs, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2007-1, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by May, Ted E, against Asset Acceptance Llc, John Doe #1 Through John Doe #12, Lori Vallo, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, Peter Vallo, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. This case was filed in Richmond County Superior Courts Richmond County Supreme Court with Jeffrey Alfano presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 08, 2017 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseRichmond County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time305 days |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 28, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 08, 2017LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 23, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 08, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2018 | Hearing |
FSC - DISCONTINUED (U) S11 TRIAL DISCONT. EFILE #25 Judge: JEFFREY ALFANO (UM) |
|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) DISCONTINUANCE OF ACTION |
|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS - STIPULATION TO DISCONTINUE & CANCEL LP |
|
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS CANCEL LP |
|
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM | |
June 19, 2018 | Hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (R) S11 TRIAL 230PM Judge: JEFFREY ALFANO (UM) |
|
April 25, 2018 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM | |
April 17, 2018 | Hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (U) S11 TRIAL 230PM Judge: JEFFREY ALFANO (UM) |
|
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGEMENT PURSUANT TO CPLR 3408 | |
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.