Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Grigg, Natalie Ann, against Coned Resi Llc, Hulya Uretener, John Doe, Volkan Uretener, represented by Dole, Vivian, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. This case was filed in Richmond County Superior Courts Richmond County Supreme Court with Conference Part Foreclosure presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeConference Part Foreclosure Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseRichmond County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time178 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 18, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 18, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 21, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 15, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 14, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 15, 2019ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #001)
Date: July 02, 2019ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: April 15, 2019RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: April 15, 2019STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 31, 2018SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2018LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 22, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001) | |
July 02, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #001) | |
June 27, 2019 | Hearing |
FSC - DISCONTINUED (U) S12 TRIAL Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE |
|
June 27, 2019 | Hearing |
ORDER ATTACHED (Motion #001) FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART MO 930AM Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE |
|
June 11, 2019 | Hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (U) FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PT 1ST 930AM FOR DISCONT. Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE |
|
June 11, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) FORCLOSURE CONF PART MO 1ST 930AM Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE |
|
June 11, 2019 | Motion |
DISCONTINUE ACTION (Motion #001) Decided: 06/27/2019ORDER ATTACHED Before Justice: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE Answer demanded: No Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE |
|
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | |
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Filed by MXT, 20185095 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.