Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, Fsb, D B A Christiana Trust As Trustee For Pnpms Trust Ii, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Frank, Thomas J., against Aleksandr Mogulyan, Cama Sdira, Llc Fbo Donna Iannuzzi Ira, Citibank, N.A., Discover Bank, John Does, (total of 5) See All represented by Kachan, Alla, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. This case was filed in Richmond County Superior Courts Richmond County Supreme Court with Conference Part Foreclosure presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseRichmond County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 11, 2019FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: October 26, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 15, 2023FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: May 12, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: November 15, 2023FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: February 16, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 15, 2020NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 11, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 23, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 20, 2020CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: December 11, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 28, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 10, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 15, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 15, 2020RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 10, 2020ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: February 10, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 15, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 15, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 15, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 15, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 15, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 15, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 05, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 18, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 31, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 15, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 15, 2020FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM
Date: May 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 10, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 23, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 10, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: February 25, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 15, 2023 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
October 26, 2023 | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM | ||
May 12, 2023 | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM | ||
February 16, 2023 | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM | ||
May 03, 2022 | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM | ||
April 18, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
May 31, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 12, 2021 | Hearing |
FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PT 1ST 930AM Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE |
|
November 10, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PT 1ST 930AM Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.