Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee For Mastr Asset Backed Securities Trust 2006-He2, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-He2, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Bettino, Diane Amy, Grigg, Natalie Ann, Matthews, Brian Patrick, Zavatsky, Deepa Janakiraman, against City Of New York Environmental Control Board, City Of New York Parking Violations Bureau, Dba In New York As Midland Funding Of Delaware, Llc, John Doe, Lori Lomeo, (total of 8) See All represented by Hanna, Derrick, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County, NY, . Richmond County, NY Superior Courts with Conference Part Foreclosure presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeConference Part Foreclosure Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 29, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time382 days |
ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: September 09, 2016LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 09, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 17, 2016REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: August 07, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 17, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 10, 2015REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: August 17, 2015ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: June 17, 2016COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: June 30, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 29, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 29, 2015ANSWER
Date: August 17, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2016 | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
July 15, 2016 | Motion |
DISCONTINUE ACTION (Motion #001) Decided: 07/15/2016ORDER ATTACHED Before Justice: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE Answer demanded: No Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE |
|
July 15, 2016 | Hearing |
ORDER ATTACHED (Motion #001) FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART MO Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE |
|
July 15, 2016 | Hearing |
FSC - SETTLED: LOAN MOD (R) FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART 930AM Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE |
|
June 17, 2016 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Filed by EAN |
||
June 17, 2016 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
June 17, 2016 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Affirmation Redacted per 22 NYCRR Plaintiff's Affirmation Redacted |
||
May 06, 2016 | Hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (R) FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART 930AM Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE |
|
February 26, 2016 | Hearing |
FSC - CONTINUED (R) FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE PART 930AM Judge: FORECLOSURE CONFERENCE |
|
February 24, 2016 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.