Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Onewest Bank, Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Falasco, Todd C, Femminella, Nicole P, against Board Of Directors Of The Woodmont Home Owners Association, Inc., John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Person Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Acting Solely As A Nominee For Delta Funding Corporation, New York City Environmental Control Board, New York City Parking Violations Bureau, (total of 8) See All represented by Goldstein, Paul, Phillips, Elliot, in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. This case was filed in Richmond County Superior Courts Richmond County Supreme Court with Charles M Troia presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 30, 2012 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseRichmond County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time753 days |
John Doe #1 Through John Doe #10, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Person Or Parties Intended Being The Persons Or Parties, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Mortgaged Premises Described In The
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: December 23, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 01, 2013ANSWER
Date: January 24, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 31, 2012AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: September 17, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 14, 2012NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: September 17, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 27, 2012STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 25, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 10, 2012STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 28, 2012RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: September 17, 2013ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001)
Date: September 17, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 23, 2014 | Docket Event | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) | |
December 22, 2014 | Hearing |
PRENOTE DISPOSITION BY MOTION DCM PART 1 Judge: HON. CHARLES M. TROIA |
|
November 01, 2013 | Motion |
DISCONTINUE ACTION (Motion #001) Decided: 11/01/2013ORDER ATTACHED Before Justice: HON. CHARLES M. TROIA Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. CHARLES M. TROIA |
|
November 01, 2013 | Hearing |
ORDER ATTACHED (Motion #001) DCM PART 1M XMG Judge: HON. CHARLES M. TROIA |
|
September 17, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
September 17, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
September 17, 2013 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) | |
September 17, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) | |
September 17, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) | |
February 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.