Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Richmond County. This case was filed in Richmond County Superior Courts with Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2017 |
CategoryTort-Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRichmond County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Cycle Time855 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2019 | Hearing |
Settled Settlement Conf/Mediation Part 60K, ON THE RECORD (Conversion) Judge: Soos, Robert |
|
April 18, 2019 | Hearing |
SETTLED BEFORE TRIAL SETTLEMENT CONF/MEDIATION PART 60K ON THE RECORD Judge: REFEREE ROBERT W SOOS |
|
March 25, 2019 | Hearing |
Held IAS Part 4 CONFER (Conversion) Judge: Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim |
|
March 25, 2019 | Hearing |
CONFERENCE HELD IAS PART 4 CONFER Judge: HON. KIM DOLLARD |
|
February 25, 2019 | Hearing |
Held IAS Part 4 Supreme Trial; CONFER (Conversion) Judge: Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim |
|
February 25, 2019 | Hearing |
STATUS CONFERENCE HELD IAS PART 4 CONFER Judge: HON. KIM DOLLARD |
|
January 18, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned DCM Part 4 CONFER (Conversion) Judge: Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim |
|
January 18, 2019 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED DCM PART 4 CONFER Judge: HON. KIM DOLLARD |
|
November 02, 2018 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #004) DCM Part 4M Judge: Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim |
|
November 02, 2018 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #003) DCM Part 4M Judge: Dollard, Hon. Mary Kim |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.