Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Alexander L. Lewis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mainetti, Alexander Eli, Mainetti, Michael, against Annie E. Rozycki, represented by Wang, Jennifer L., in the jurisdiction of Rensselaer County, NY, . Rensselaer County, NY Superior Courts with Laura M. Jordan presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationRensselaer County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York. The plaintiff, Alexander L. Lewis, is suing the defendant, Annie E. Rozycki, for negligence in a motor vehicle accident. According to the complaint, on October 9,...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 19, 2024RESPONSE TO DEMAND Pltf Resp to Deft Discovery Demands
Date: January 19, 2024BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 19, 2024DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 12, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 03, 2024ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 02, 2024NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 06, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 02, 2024ANSWER
Date: November 29, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 02, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 22, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 01, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 31, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 19, 2024 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Pltf Resp to Deft Discovery Demands Pltf Resp to Deft Discovery Demands Possible SSN Administratively Redacted |
||
January 19, 2024 |
BILL OF PARTICULARS Pltf Verified Bill of Particulars |
||
January 03, 2024 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Defendant's Case Status Letter to Court |
||
January 02, 2024 |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ADJOURNED |
||
January 02, 2024 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Pltf Case Status Letter to Court |
||
January 02, 2024 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed PC Stip & Order |
||
December 12, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Pltf Combined Discovery Demands |
||
December 12, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS for Pltf Dems |
||
December 06, 2023 | NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.